There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Protect our Kids Act of 2012

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protect our Kids Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

Protect our Kids Act of 2012

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protect our Kids Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a commission to develop a national strategy and recommendations for reducing fatalities resulting from child abuse and neglect.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
01/14/2013Became Public Law No: 112-275. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2013Signed by President.
01/03/2013Presented to President.
01/02/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
01/02/2013Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8666-8667)
01/02/2013Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8666-8667)
12/19/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 330 - 77 (Roll no. 636).(text: CR H7313-7314)
12/13/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
01/14/2013Became Public Law No: 112-275. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2013Signed by President.
01/03/2013HousePresented to President.
01/02/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/02/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
01/02/2013SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8666-8667)
01/02/2013SenateReferred to the Committee on Finance.
01/02/2013SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8666-8667)
12/19/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
12/19/2012-5:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2012-5:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 330 - 77 (Roll no. 636). (text: CR H7313-7314)
12/19/2012-4:36pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7327-7328)
12/19/2012-3:31pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/19/2012-3:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6655.
12/19/2012-3:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7313-7317)
12/19/2012-3:12pmHouseMr. Camp moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/13/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
12/13/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means12/13/2012 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions12/19/2012 Referred to
01/02/2013 Discharged from
Senate Finance01/02/2013 Referred to
01/02/2013 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6655. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-275 (01/14/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Protect Our Kids Act of 2012 - Establishes the Commission to Eliminate Child Abuse and Neglect Fatalities to: (1) study the use of child protective services and child welfare services under titles IV and XX (Block Grants to States for Social Services) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to reduce fatalities from child abuse and neglect; (2) develop recommendations to reduce such fatalities for federal, state, and local agencies, and private sector and nonprofit organizations, including recommendations to implement a comprehensive national strategy for such purpose; and (3) develop guidelines for the type of information that should be tracked to improve interventions to prevent such fatalities.

Requires any federal agency affected by a recommendation to report to Congress its response and plans to address it.

Amends SSA title IV part A (Temporary Assistance for Needy Families) (TANF) to make an adjustment to the Contingency Fund for State Welfare Programs with respect to deposits for FY2013-FY2014, reserving a specified amount for Commission activities.