Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/03/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/03/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/29/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/15/2011