There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Video Privacy Protection Act Amendments Act of 2012

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Video Privacy Protection Act Amendments Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

Video Privacy Protection Act Amendments Act of 2012

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Video Privacy Protection Act Amendments Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 2710 of title 18, United States Code, to clarify that a video tape service provider may obtain a consumer's informed, written consent on an ongoing basis and that consent may be obtained through the Internet.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
01/10/2013Became Public Law No: 112-258. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2013Signed by President.
12/31/2012Presented to President.
12/20/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8320-8321)
12/18/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6849-6850)
12/17/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
01/10/2013Became Public Law No: 112-258. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2013Signed by President.
12/31/2012HousePresented to President.
12/21/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8320-8321)
12/19/2012SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/18/2012-2:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/18/2012-2:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6849-6850)
12/18/2012-1:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6671.
12/18/2012-1:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6849-6851)
12/18/2012-1:48pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/17/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
12/17/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary12/17/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6671. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-258 (01/10/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Video Privacy Protection Act Amendments Act of 2012 - Amends provisions of the federal criminal code authorizing a video tape service provider to disclose personally identifiable information concerning any consumer to any person with the informed, written consent of the consumer to: (1) allow such consent to be provided through an electronic means using the Internet; (2) require such consent to be in a form distinct and separate from any form setting forth other legal or financial obligations of the consumer; (3) allow such consent to be given in advance for a set period of time, not to exceed two years or until consent is withdrawn by the consumer, whichever is sooner; and (4) require the video tape service provider to provide an opportunity for the consumer to withdraw such consent on a case-by-case basis or to withdraw from ongoing disclosures, at the consumer's election.