Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/11/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 02/11/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/19/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/19/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/19/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/04/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/04/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/26/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/31/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/23/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/10/2012