There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To convey certain submerged lands to the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands in order to give that territory the same benefits in its submerged lands as Guam, the Virgin Islands, and American Samoa have in their submerged lands.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/03/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 397 - 0 (Roll no. 744).(text: CR H6480)
07/20/2011Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-162.
02/11/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
10/04/2011SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
10/03/2011-7:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/03/2011-7:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 397 - 0 (Roll no. 744). (text: CR H6480)
10/03/2011-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6487)
10/03/2011-4:52pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/03/2011-4:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 670.
10/03/2011-4:45pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6480-6481)
10/03/2011-4:45pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/20/2011HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 107.
07/20/2011HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-162.
06/15/2011HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
06/15/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/15/2011HouseSubcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged.
05/12/2011HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs
02/16/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/11/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/11/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/11/2011 Referred to
06/15/2011 Markup by
07/20/2011 Reported by H. Rept. 112-162
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs02/16/2011 Referred to
05/12/2011 Hearings by
06/15/2011 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources10/04/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.670. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/03/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Conveys to the government of the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands submerged lands surrounding such Islands and extending three geographical miles outward from their coastlines.