Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  1. S.Amdt.930 to S.Amdt.927   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 11/10/2011)
  2. S.Amdt.929 to S.Amdt.927   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/09/2011)
  3. S.Amdt.928 to S.Amdt.927   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To provide American jobs through economic growth.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 11/08/2011) (Proposed 11/09/2011)
    Latest Action: 11/10/11 Amendment SA 928, under the order of 11/8/2011, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 40 - 56. Record Vote Number: 202.
  4. S.Amdt.927   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permit a 100 percent levy for payments to Federal vendors relating to property, to require a study on how to reduce the amount of Federal taxes owed but not paid by Federal contractors, and to make certain improvements in the laws relating to the employment and training of veterans.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 11/08/2011) (Proposed 11/08/2011)
    Latest Action: 11/10/11 Amendment SA 927 as modified, under the order of 11/8/2011, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 1. Record Vote Number: 203. (text as modified: CR S7330-7336)
  5. S.Amdt.926   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 11/08/2011)
  6. S.Amdt.925   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 11/08/2011)
  7. S.Amdt.924   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 11/07/2011)
  8. H.Amdt.847   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: House Committee on Rules (Offered 10/27/2011)