There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Expanded & Improved Medicare For All Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for comprehensive health insurance coverage for all United States residents, improved health care delivery, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/11/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
02/18/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/16/2011Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/14/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/11/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/28/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/28/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/28/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/16/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/03/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/13/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/13/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/31/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/13/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 06/13/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/22/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/22/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/08/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/25/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/25/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/02/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/24/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/24/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/28/2012

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/11/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/18/2011 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/11/2011 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/14/2011 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/11/2011 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs02/16/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.676.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.676. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2011)

Expanded & Improved Medicare for All Act - Establishes the Medicare for All Program to provide all individuals residing in the United States and U.S. territories with free health care that includes all medically necessary care, such as primary care and prevention, dietary and nutritional therapies, prescription drugs, emergency care, long-term care, mental health services, dental services, and vision care.

Prohibits an institution from participating unless it is a public or nonprofit institution. Allows nonprofit health maintenance organizations (HMOs) that deliver care in their own facilities to participate.

Gives patients the freedom to choose from participating physicians and institutions.

Prohibits a private health insurer from selling health insurance coverage that duplicates the benefits provided under this Act. Allows such insurers to sell benefits that are not medically necessary, such as cosmetic surgery benefits.

Sets forth methods to pay institutional providers of care and health professionals for services. Prohibits financial incentives between HMOs and physicians based on utilization.

Establishes the Medicare for All Trust Fund to finance the Program with amounts deposited: (1) from existing sources of government revenues for health care; (2) by increasing personal income taxes on the top 5% income earners; (3) by instituting a modest and progressive excise tax on payroll and self-employment income; (4) instituting a modest tax on unearned income; and (5) by instituting a small tax on stock and bond transactions. Transfers and appropriates to carry out this Act amounts that would have been appropriated for federal public health care programs, including Medicare, Medicaid, and the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP, formerly known as SCHIP).

Requires the Medicare for All Program to give first priority in retraining and job placement and employment transition benefits to individuals whose jobs are eliminated due to reduced administration.

Requires creation of a confidential electronic patient record system.

Establishes a National Board of Universal Quality and Access to provide advice on quality, access, and affordability.

Provides for: (1) the eventual integration of the Indian Health Service into the Program; and (2) evaluation of the continued independence of Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) health programs.