Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/28/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/28/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/28/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/16/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/03/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/13/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/13/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/31/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/13/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 06/13/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/22/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/22/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/08/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/25/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/25/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/02/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/24/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/24/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/28/2012