Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/11/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/11/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/02/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/09/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/05/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/10/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/25/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/14/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/23/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/30/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/11/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 10/11/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/21/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/13/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/26/2012