Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 02/11/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/16/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/09/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/09/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/06/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/06/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/06/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/06/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/14/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/14/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/04/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/04/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 05/25/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/25/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/24/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/25/2012