Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/12/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/12/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/12/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 01/12/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/18/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/25/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/25/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/25/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/25/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/25/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/25/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/10/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/10/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/09/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew