Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/14/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/14/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 02/16/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/16/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/16/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/16/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/16/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/16/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/16/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 02/16/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/16/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/16/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/18/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/18/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/18/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/11/2011