There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Nuclear Family Priority Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to make changes related to family-sponsored immigrants and to reduce the number of such immigrants, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/14/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/28/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/14/2011Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/16/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/17/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/17/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/17/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 02/28/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/28/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/28/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/01/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/01/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/02/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/02/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/02/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 03/02/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/03/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/10/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/08/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/14/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/23/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/23/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/20/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/08/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/16/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/13/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 03/16/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 06/01/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 06/19/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/14/2011 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement02/28/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.692.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.692. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2011)

Nuclear Family Priority Act - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to replace existing family-sponsored immigrant categories with a single preference allocation for spouses and children of permanent resident aliens.

Reduces the number of, and revises the calculation for, fiscal year family-sponsored immigrant entrants.

Establishes a nonimmigrant visa category for an alien who is a parent of a U.S. citizen at least 21 years old.