Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 02/14/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/16/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/01/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/15/2011