Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/16/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/16/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/16/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/17/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/11/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/06/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/02/2011