Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/15/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/15/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/28/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/03/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/10/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/10/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/10/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/01/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 04/14/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 04/14/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/24/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 08/01/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/09/2011