Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/28/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/01/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/24/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/25/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/01/2011