Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/15/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/03/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/31/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/16/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/19/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 12/20/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/17/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/25/2012