Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/15/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/18/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/28/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/09/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/29/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/30/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/01/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/02/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/02/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/05/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/25/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/31/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/02/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/18/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/17/2012