Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/17/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/18/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/18/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/18/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/18/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/03/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/03/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/03/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/15/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/15/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/30/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/30/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/06/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/06/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/06/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/15/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/15/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/10/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/10/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/10/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/10/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/12/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/12/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/12/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/25/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 05/25/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/25/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/25/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/25/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/03/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/03/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/24/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/24/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/24/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/07/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/07/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/07/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/29/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/29/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/15/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/15/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/15/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/15/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/15/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/15/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/13/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/16/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/16/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/16/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/16/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/06/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/15/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/15/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/17/2012
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/07/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/22/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/09/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/30/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/01/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/26/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/28/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/29/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/31/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/14/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/19/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/13/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/13/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/15/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/27/2012