Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/03/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/15/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/15/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/15/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/15/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/15/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/15/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/15/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/15/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/15/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/15/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/30/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/04/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/12/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/12/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/05/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/05/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/12/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/12/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 05/25/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/16/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/07/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/07/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/07/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/07/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/07/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/11/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/12/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/12/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/21/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/25/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/29/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 08/01/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/07/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/21/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/22/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/06/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/03/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/03/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/03/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/16/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/01/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/12/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/14/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/31/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 02/02/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/29/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/29/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/01/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/07/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/07/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/07/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 03/07/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/07/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/07/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/07/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/07/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/07/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/07/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/07/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/07/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/07/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/07/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/07/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/07/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/07/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/07/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/22/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 04/17/2012
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 04/17/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/25/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/25/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/25/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/25/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 05/09/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 05/30/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/30/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/07/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/26/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/28/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/12/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/12/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/18/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/23/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 08/01/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/02/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/10/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/10/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/19/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/19/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 09/20/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/13/2012