There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Airline Passenger Bill of Rights Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to ensure air passengers have access to necessary services while on a grounded air carrier, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/15/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/16/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/15/2011Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/18/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/18/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/11/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/17/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/17/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/29/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/10/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/25/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/15/2011 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation02/16/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.729.


Subjects (5)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Aviation and airports
  • Consumer affairs
  • Department of Transportation

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.729. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/15/2011)

Airline Passenger Bill of Rights Act of 2011 - Requires each air carrier and airport operator to submit for approval by the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) a proposed contingency plan meeting minimum standards established by the Secretary.

Requires an air carrier to provide passengers on a departure- or arrival-delayed grounded aircraft with: (1) adequate food, water, restrooms, ventilation, and medical services; as well as (2) a time frame under which passengers may deplane a delayed aircraft after three hours, except in specified circumstances.

Requires an airport operator plan to describe: (1) how passengers will be deplaned following a long tarmac delay, and (2) how facilities will be shared and gates made available to aircraft that experience such delays.

Authorizes the Secretary to assess a civil penalty against air carriers and airport operators that fail to submit, obtain approval of, or adhere to a contingency plan. Requires public access to such plans.

Directs the Secretary to establish a consumer hotline telephone number for air passenger complaints.