Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/15/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/18/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/18/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/11/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/17/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/17/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/29/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/10/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/25/2012