Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/18/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/18/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/18/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/18/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/18/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/18/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/03/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/10/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/31/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/07/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 04/07/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/07/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 04/07/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/07/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/13/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/13/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/14/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/02/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/02/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/02/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/24/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/01/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/02/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 08/01/2011