Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/03/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/03/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/03/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/03/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/03/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/03/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/08/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/08/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/09/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/09/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/09/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/09/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/09/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/09/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/09/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/09/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/09/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/09/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/10/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/15/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/15/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/30/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/31/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/04/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/04/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/04/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/04/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/04/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/04/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/04/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/06/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/06/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/06/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/03/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/07/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/07/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/12/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/09/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/14/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/29/2012