Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/24/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/27/2011