Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/17/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/26/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/02/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/02/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/22/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/22/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/11/2011