Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/17/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/01/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/26/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/07/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/15/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/27/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/15/2012