Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/01/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/10/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/10/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/16/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/30/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/03/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/03/2011