Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
10/12/2011 Became Public Law No: 112-38. (TXT | PDF)
10/12/2011 Signed by President.
10/06/2011 Presented to President.
10/04/2011 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/2011 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6143)
06/21/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 0 (Roll no. 461).(text: CR H4342)
02/17/2011 Introduced in House