Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/02/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/14/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/17/2012