There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Responsible End to the War in Afghanistan Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that funds for operations of the Armed Forces in Afghanistan shall be obligated and expended only for purposes of providing for the safe and orderly withdrawal from Afghanistan of all members of the Armed Forces and Department of Defense contractor personnel who are in Afghanistan.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/17/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/17/2011Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/17/2011Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/17/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/17/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/18/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/03/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/11/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/01/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/04/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/03/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/04/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/19/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/15/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/14/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/07/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 09/10/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/17/2011 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs02/17/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.780. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/17/2011)

Responsible End to the War in Afghanistan Act - States that it is the policy of the United States to ensure that funds made available for operations of the Armed Forces in Afghanistan are to be used only for providing for the safe and orderly withdrawal of all U.S. military personnel and Department of Defense (DOD) contractor personnel in Afghanistan.

Allows such funds to be obligated and expended only for such purpose.