Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/17/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/18/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/03/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/11/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/01/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/04/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/03/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/04/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/19/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/15/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/14/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/07/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 09/10/2012