Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/18/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/28/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/28/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/28/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/02/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/02/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/14/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/04/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/25/2012