Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/17/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/10/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/10/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/17/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/07/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/07/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/05/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/05/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/26/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/16/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/16/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/16/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/16/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/24/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/24/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/24/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/28/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/28/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/25/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/19/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/19/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/14/2012