There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

For the relief of Allan Bolor Kelley.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/04/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
07/24/2012Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-620.
02/17/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
12/05/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
12/04/2012-12:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/04/2012-12:30pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
12/04/2012-12:29pmHouseConsidered from the Private Calendar.
07/24/2012HousePlaced on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 4.
07/24/2012HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-620.
06/28/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
06/28/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/26/2012HouseSubcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement Discharged.
02/28/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/17/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
02/17/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/17/2011 Referred to
06/28/2012 Markup by
07/24/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-620
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement02/28/2011 Referred to
06/26/2012 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary12/05/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.794.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.794. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/17/2011)

Provides for the relief of Allan Bolor Kelley.