Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/05/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/08/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/31/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/23/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 07/11/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 08/26/2011
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 08/26/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/21/2011