Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
01/02/2013 Became Public Law No: 112-240.
01/02/2013 Signed by President.
01/02/2013 Presented to President.
01/01/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by recorded vote: 257 - 167 (Roll no. 659).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7536-7551)
01/01/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate, under the order of 1/1/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Yea-Nay Vote. 89 - 8. Record Vote Number: 251.
08/01/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 256 - 171 (Roll no. 545).
07/24/2012 Introduced in House