Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/16/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/14/2011