Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/04/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/04/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/14/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/30/2012