Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/05/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/06/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/16/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/27/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/29/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/07/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/26/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/09/2012