Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/04/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/04/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/03/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/29/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/08/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/08/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/15/2012