Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/15/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/30/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/04/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/04/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/06/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/06/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/05/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/05/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/05/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/25/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/25/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/21/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/21/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/07/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/07/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/21/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/21/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/23/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/23/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/06/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/06/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/13/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/13/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/13/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/03/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/03/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/16/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/16/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/08/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/01/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/15/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/27/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/27/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 10/26/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/13/2012