Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/30/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/08/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/17/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/10/2012