Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/18/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/03/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/15/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/05/2011