Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/01/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/01/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/01/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/01/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/01/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/03/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/03/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/09/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/09/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/09/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/11/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/11/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/11/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/31/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/31/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/31/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/01/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/07/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/07/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/08/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/08/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/08/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/08/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/08/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/08/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/08/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/24/2012