Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/18/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/18/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/01/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/01/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/01/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/01/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/03/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/08/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/08/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/08/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/08/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/16/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/16/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/16/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/16/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/16/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/16/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/16/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/16/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/31/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/08/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/14/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/14/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/14/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/03/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/03/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/03/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/03/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/02/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/02/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/02/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/06/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/01/2011