Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/09/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/09/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/12/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/06/2011