Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/08/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/08/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/08/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/08/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/08/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/08/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/08/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/08/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/08/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/08/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/08/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/08/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/08/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/03/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/03/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/03/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/03/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/03/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/03/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/03/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/03/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/03/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/03/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/03/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/03/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 11/03/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/03/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/18/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/23/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/23/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/23/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/23/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/23/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/02/2012