Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/28/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/16/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/07/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/12/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/15/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/02/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/03/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/10/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/10/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/22/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/27/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 08/16/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/21/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/06/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/19/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 06/20/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/20/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/29/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/12/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/24/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/14/2012